skip to content

Yazdan-Ashoori, Payam

CPSO#: 97716

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 01 Jul 2012
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 30 Jun 2016

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, Persian

Education:Queen's University, 2012

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Royal Victoria Hospital
201 Georgian Drive
Cardiorespiratory Department
Barrie ON  L4M 6M2
Phone: 705-728-9090 Ext. 46265
Fax: 705-737-2373 Electoral District: 05

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Aliyarzadeh & Yazdan-Ashoori Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Feb 02 2016

Shareholders:
Dr. P. Yazdan-Ashoori ( CPSO# 97716 )
Dr. H. Aliyarzadeh ( CPSO# 97734 )

Business Address:
Unit D12
829 Big Bay Pt. Road
Barrie ON  L4N 0G5

Business Address:
201 Georgian Drive
Barrie ON  L4M 6M2

Business Address:
Unit 216
11 Victoria Street
Barrie ON  L4N 6T3

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Royal Victoria Regional Health Centre Barrie

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective:30 Jun 2016 RCPSC Specialist
Cardiology Effective:18 Oct 2018 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. PAYAM YAZDAN-ASHOORI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. YAZDAN-ASHOORI is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



McMaster University, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 1 - Internal Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 2 - Internal Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 3 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2015 to 30 Jun 2016
PostGrad Yr 4 - Cardiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2016 to 30 Jun 2017
PostGrad Yr 5 - Cardiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2017 to 30 Jun 2018
PostGrad Yr 6 - Cardiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2018 to 30 Jun 2019
CF - Cardiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2012
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2016