skip to content

Yau, Vivian Ka Yan

CPSO#: 96555

MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Resigned from membership as of 05 Aug 2020
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None as of 03 May 2018

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Queensland, 2009

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Vivian Yau Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Sep 3 2019

Medical Records Location

Address: Thunder Bay Regional Cancer Centre, 980 Oliver Road, Thunder Bay, Ontario P7B 6V4
Date Received: 05 Aug 2020

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Radiation Oncology Effective:30 Jun 2016 RCPSC Specialist

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



University Of Toronto, 13 Jul 2011 to 04 Oct 2011
AVP - Radiation Oncology

University Of Toronto, 05 Oct 2011 to 12 Jul 2012
PostGrad Yr 1 - Radiation Oncology

University Of Toronto, 13 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 2 - Radiation Oncology

University Of Toronto, 01 Jul 2013 to 12 Jul 2013
PostGrad Yr 2 - Radiation Oncology

University Of Toronto, 13 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 3 - Radiation Oncology

University Of Toronto, 01 Jul 2014 to 12 Jul 2014
PostGrad Yr 3 - Radiation Oncology

University Of Toronto, 13 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 4 - Radiation Oncology

University Of Toronto, 01 Jul 2015 to 12 Jul 2015
PostGrad Yr 4 - Radiation Oncology

University Of Toronto, 13 Jul 2015 to 30 Jun 2016
PostGrad Yr 5 - Radiation Oncology

University Of Toronto, 01 Jul 2016 to 28 Apr 2017
CF - Radiation Oncology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 13 Jul 2011
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 05 Oct 2011
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 28 Apr 2017
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 03 May 2018
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 05 Aug 2020