skip to content

Yau, Daphne Kit Han

CPSO#: 93214

MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Resigned from membership as of 01 Jun 2018
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None as of 29 Mar 2016

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, French

Education:Queen's University, 2010

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Medical Records Location

Address: Department of Paediatrics Endocrinology Royal Manchester Children's Hospital Oxford Rd Machester UK M13 9WL Tel: 0161-701-1675
Date Received: 02 May 2019

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Pediatrics Effective:30 Jun 2015 RCPSC Specialist
Endocrinology and Metabolism Effective:27 Sep 2016 RCPSC Specialist

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 1 - Pediatrics

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2012 to 09 Mar 2013
PostGrad Yr 2 - Pediatrics

Queen's University, 10 Mar 2013 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 3 - Pediatrics

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2013 to 07 Apr 2014
PostGrad Yr 3 - Pediatrics

University of Ottawa, 05 Apr 2016 to 02 May 2016
EL - Paediatric Endocrinology and Metabolism

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2010
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 07 Apr 2014
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 29 Mar 2016
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 01 Jun 2018