skip to content

Yatsynovich, Viktor

CPSO#: 92412

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 28 Nov 2012
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Restricted as of 28 Nov 2012

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Belarusian State Medical University, 1991

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Yatsynovich Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Oct 22 2019

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.



USA - Kentucky
USA - New York

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Lakeridge Health,Ajax and Pickering Site Ajax

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Psychiatry Effective:28 Nov 2012 CPSO Recognized Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 11 Jan 2010
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 11 Jan 2010
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 10 Jan 2013
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 28 Nov 2012
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 28 Nov 2012
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee Effective: 26 Feb 2014
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee Effective: 20 Nov 2014
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee Effective: 18 Sep 2015
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee Effective: 28 Jan 2016

Practice Restrictions

Imposed By Effective Date Expiry Date Status
Registration Committee Effective: 28 Jan 2016 Active
             Dr. Viktor Yatsynovich may practise medicine independently in psychiatry.