skip to content

Yassin, Asma'a Abdul Rahman

CPSO#: 86987

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 10 Jul 2015
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 10 Jul 2015

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: Arabic, English

Education:University of Mosul, 1993

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
11811 Tecumseh Rd E
Phone: 5199793355
Fax: 5199791429

Additional Practice Location(s)

2525 Roseville Garden Dr
Phone: (519) 944-3393
County: 
Electoral District: 

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective:09 Jul 2015 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. ASMA'A ABDUL RAHMAN YASSIN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. YASSIN is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



McMaster University, 01 Jul 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
PostGrad Yr 1 - Neurosurgery

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 2 - Neurosurgery

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 3 - Neurosurgery

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 4 - Neurosurgery

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 5 - Neurosurgery

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 5 - Neurosurgery

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2013 to 21 Oct 2013
PostGrad Yr 5 - Neurosurgery

McMaster University, 22 Oct 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2007
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2015
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 10 Jul 2015