skip to content

Yasinian, Azadeh Yasmin

CPSO#: 97488

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 20 Nov 2014
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Restricted as of 20 Nov 2014

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, Farsi

Education:Xavier University School of Medicine, 2006

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Unit 3
1015 Golf Links Rd
Ancaster ON  L9K1L6
Phone: (905) 304-8001
Fax: (289) 426-0833 Electoral District: 04

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Yasinian Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jun 18 2014

Shareholders:
Dr. A. Yasinian ( CPSO# 97488 )

Business Address:
Unit 3
1015 Golflinks Road
Ancaster ON  L9K 1L6
Phone Number: (905) 304-8001

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective:20 Nov 2014 CPSO Recognized Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 07 May 2012
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 07 May 2012
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 06 Nov 2013
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 11 Aug 2014
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 20 Nov 2014

Practice Restrictions

Imposed By Effective Date Expiry Date Status
Registration Committee Effective: 20 Nov 2014 Active
 Dr.  Azadeh  Yasmin  Yasinian  may  practise  medicine  independently in family
            medicine, only.