skip to content

Yaseen, Muhammad

CPSO#: 85309

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 04 Jul 2006
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 29 Jun 2012

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, Hindi, Panjabi/Punjabi, Urdu

Education:Punjab University, Pakistan, 1998

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Woodstock General Hospital
310 Juliana Drive
Woodstock ON  N4V 0A6
Phone: (519) 421-4211 Ext. 2204 Electoral District: 02

Additional Practice Location(s)

15A-450 Westheights Dr
Kitchener ON  N2N2B9
Canada
Phone: 226-646-0282
Fax: 226-646-0283
County: Regional Municipality of Waterloo
Electoral District: 03

795 Ottawa St S
Kitchener ON  N2E 0A5
Canada
Phone: 2266460282
Fax: 2266460283
County: Regional Municipality of Waterloo
Electoral District: 03

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Dr. Muhammad Yaseen Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Aug 17 2012

Shareholders:
Dr. M. Yaseen ( CPSO# 85309 )

Business Address:
795 Ottawa St S
Kitchener ON  N2E 0A5

Business Address:
310 Juliana Drive
Woodstock ON  N4V 0A4
Phone Number: (519) 421-4211

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Woodstock General Hospital Woodstock

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Anesthesiology Effective:07 Jun 2012 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. MUHAMMAD YASEEN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. YASEEN is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



University Of Toronto, 01 Jul 2006 to 22 Sep 2006
AVP - Anesthesiology

University Of Toronto, 23 Sep 2006 to 30 Jun 2007
PostGrad Yr 1 - Anesthesiology

University Of Toronto, 01 Jul 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
PostGrad Yr 2 - Anesthesiology

University Of Toronto, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 3 - Anesthesiology

University Of Toronto, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 4 - Anesthesiology

University Of Toronto, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 5 - Anesthesiology

University Of Toronto, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
CF - Anesthesiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 04 Jul 2006
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 23 Sep 2006
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 29 Jun 2012