skip to content

Yardley, Trevor Wayne

CPSO#: 27529

MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Resigned from membership as of 01 Jun 2016
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None as of 01 Jun 2016

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, French

Education:University of Toronto, 1974

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.



USA - Pennsylvania

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Orthopedic Surgery Effective: 14 Nov 1980 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 28 May 1974
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 09 Jul 1975
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 01 Jun 2016