skip to content

Yarascavitch, Alec James

CPSO#: 93303

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 01 Jul 2010
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 27 Jun 2012

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:McMaster University, 2010

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
100 Frank Miller Drive
Huntsville ON  P1H 1H7
Phone: (705) 789-2311 Electoral District: 05

Additional Practice Location(s)

75 Ann Street
Bracebridge ON  P1L 2E4
Canada
Phone: (705) 645-4404
County: District Municipality of Muskoka
Electoral District: 05

50 College Drive
North Bay ON  P1B 5A4
Canada
Phone: 705-474-8600
County: Territorial District of Nipissing
Electoral District: 08

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Jennifer Meloche Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Dec 10 2018

Shareholders:
Dr. J. Meloche ( CPSO# 100174)
Dr. A. Yarascavitch ( CPSO# 93303 )

Business Address:
2nd Floor
1000 Middlegate Road
Mississauga ON  L4Y 1M4
Phone Number: (905) 804-7000

Business Address:
2200 Eglinton Avenue West
Mississauga ON  L5M 2N1

Business Address:
100 Queensway West
Mississauga ON  L5B 1B8

Business Address:
150 Sherway Drive
Toronto ON  M9C 1A5

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Muskoka Algonquin Health Care,South Muskoka Memorial Site Bracebridge
Muskoka Algonquin Healthcare,Huntsville District Memorial Hospital Huntsville
North Bay Regional Health Centre North Bay
Oakville Trafalgar Memorial Hospital Oakville

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 25 Jun 2012 CFPC Specialist
Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine) Effective: 18 Oct 2013 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. ALEC JAMES YARASCAVITCH may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. YARASCAVITCH is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



Northern Ontario School Of Medicine, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

Northern Ontario School Of Medicine, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Northern Ontario School Of Medicine, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 3 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2010
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 27 Jun 2012