skip to content

Yap, Stanley Alexander

CPSO#: 93492

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 21 Nov 2017
EXPIRY DATE
20 Nov 2019
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Restricted as of 21 Nov 2017
Flag: Indicates a concern or additional information

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Loyola University of Chicago, 2004

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Rouge Valley Centenary Hospital
2867 Ellesmere Rd
Scarborough ON  M1E 4B9
Phone: (416) 289-3200 Electoral District: 10

Additional Practice Location(s)

Scarborough General Hospital
3050 Lawrence Ave E
Scarborough ON  M1P 2V5
Canada
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10

Scarbourough Hospital
Birchmount Campus
3030 Birchmount Rd
Scarborough ON  M1W 3W3
Canada
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10

North York General Hospital
4001 Leslie St
North York ON  M2K 1E1
Canada
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Stanley A. Yap Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Nov 06 2018

Shareholders:
Dr. S. Yap ( CPSO# 93492 )

Business Address:
507 - 3030 Lawrence Avenue East
Scarborough ON  M1P 2T7
Phone Number: (416) 289-3200


Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.



USA - California

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
North York General Hospital,General Division Toronto
Rouge Valley Centenary Health Centre,Toronto Toronto
Scarborough Hospital,General Site Toronto
Scarborough Hospital-Birchmount Campus Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Urology Effective: 18 Jun 2012 RCPSC Specialist

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
Clinical Fellow - Urology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
Clinical Fellow - Urology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
Clinical Fellow - Urology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2010
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 22 Nov 2011
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 22 Nov 2011
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 29 Mar 2014
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 21 Nov 2017
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee Effective: 11 Apr 2019
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration Expiry Date: 20 Nov 2019

Practice Restrictions Flag: indicates a concern or additional information

Imposed By Effective Date Expiry Date Status
Registration Committee Effective: 11 Apr 2019 Active
             1.    Dr.   Stanley  Alexander  Yap  may  practise  urology  at  the  following
                  locations, while under supervision coordinated by a supervisor acceptable
                  to the College:

                  (i)   Rouge Valley Centenary Hospital in Scarborough, Ontario;
                  
                  (ii)  Scarborough Hospital - General Campus in Scarborough, Ontario;
                  
                  (iii) Scarborough  Hospital  - Birchmount Campus in Scarborough, Ontario;
                        and,
                  
                  (iv)  North York General Hospital in North York, Ontario.
                  
            2.    The certificate of registration  automatically  expires  on  November 20,
                  2019.

            3.    The certificate of registration automatically expires upon the  following
                  events, unless the Registration Committee renews the certificate  with or
                  without additional or other terms, conditions and limitations:

                  (i)   the  supervisor notifies the College of any concerns regarding  Dr.
                        Yap's  knowledge, skill, judgment or attitude, does not provide the
                        required  reports  to the College by the due date or if the reports
                        are unsatisfactory in form or content, or
                  
                  (ii)  the  supervisor  is no  longer  able  or  willing  to  continue  to
                        supervise Dr. Yap's practice, or
                  
                  (iii) the College finds  the assessment report, pertaining to the on-site
                        assessment of Dr. Yap's practice unsatisfactory.
                  
                  
            Note: This certificate is issued  on  November  21, 2017, and will expire on or
                  before November 20, 2019, in accordance with paragraphs 2 and 3 above.