skip to content

Yao, James Ka-Ying

CPSO#: 21430

MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Resigned from membership as of 01 Jun 2013
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None as of 28 Jun 1968

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: Chinese, English, Filipino

Education:University of the Philippines, 1958

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Medical Records Location

Address: Patients looking to obtain a copy of their medical records should contact: St. Michael's Hospital Medical Records Department 30 Bond Street Toronto, ON M5B 1W8 Tel: (416) 360-4000
Date Received: 24 Jun 2013

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Cardiovascular and Thoracic Surgery Effective:17 Nov 1967 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 24 Jun 1959
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 28 Jun 1968
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 01 Jun 2013