skip to content

Yang, Yee Kwan

CPSO#: 89830

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 01 Jul 2013
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 02 Nov 2015

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: Cantonese, English, Mandarin

Education:University of Hong Kong, 2002

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Angel Kids Pediatrics
Suite 210, 5293 Highway 7 E
Markham ON  L3P 7M7
Phone: 905 472 5326
Fax: 905 472 5017 Electoral District: 05

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Dr. Y. K. Yang Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jun 15 2018

Shareholders:
Dr. Y. Yang ( CPSO# 89830 )

Business Address:
210-5293 Highway 7 E
Markham ON  L3P 7M7
Phone Number: 905 472 5326

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Pediatrics Effective:19 Jun 2014 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. YEE KWAN YANG may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. YANG is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



McMaster University, 03 Sep 2008 to 16 Sep 2008
PEAP - R - Pediatric Hematology/Oncology

McMaster University, 17 Sep 2008 to 30 Nov 2008
EL - Pediatric Hematology/Oncology

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
CF - Pediatric Hematology/Oncology

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
CF - Pediatric Hematology/Oncology

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2015 to 11 Jan 2016
CF - Pediatric Hematology/Oncology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 03 Sep 2008
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 17 Sep 2008
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Nov 2008
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2013
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 02 Nov 2015