skip to content

Yang, Xiao Dong

CPSO#: 85185

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 01 Jul 2006
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 30 Jun 2012

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: Chinese, English

Education:University of Toronto, 2006

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Sunnybrook Health Sciences Centre
Division of Neurosurgery
2075 Bayview Avenue, M6-100
Toronto ON  M4N 3M5
Phone: 416-480-6100 Ext. 87576
Fax: 416-480-4689 Electoral District: 10

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Dr. Xiao Dong Yang Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Dec 04 2012

Shareholders:
Dr. X. Yang ( CPSO# 85185 )

Business Address:
Division of Neurosurgery
2075 Bayview Avenue
Suite M6-156
Toronto ON  M4N 3M5
Phone Number: (416) 480-6100

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Sunnybrook Health Sciences Centre Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Neurosurgery Effective: 30 Jun 2012 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. XIAO DONG YANG may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. YANG is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2006 to 30 Jun 2007
PostGrad Yr 1 - Neurosurgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
PostGrad Yr 2 - Neurosurgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 3 - Neurosurgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 4 - Neurosurgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 5 - Neurosurgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 6 - Neurosurgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2012 to 06 Dec 2012
Clinical Fellow - Diagnostic Radiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2006
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2012