skip to content

Yang, Teng-Chih

CPSO#: 96174

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 01 Jul 2011
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 30 Jun 2016

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, Mandarin

Education:University of Toronto, 2011

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Huntsville Professional Building
Suite 205
348 Muskoka Road 3 North
Huntsville ON  P1H 1H8
Phone: (705) 789-6401
Fax: (705) 990-2757 Electoral District: 05

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Leung & Yang Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jul 17 2012

Shareholders:
Dr. D. Leung ( CPSO# 88525 )
Dr. T. Yang ( CPSO# 96174 )

Business Address:
100 Frank Miller Drive
Huntsville ON  P1H 1H7
Phone Number: (705) 789-2311

Business Address:
205 - 348 Muskoka Road 3 North
Huntsville ON  P1H 1H8

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Muskoka Algonquin Healthcare,Huntsville District Memorial Hospital Huntsville

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
General Surgery Effective: 30 Jun 2016 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. TENG-CHIH YANG may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. YANG is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 1 - General Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 2 - General Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 3 - General Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 4 - General Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2015 to 30 Jun 2016
PostGrad Yr 5 - General Surgery

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2011
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2016