skip to content

Yang, Simon Yie

CPSO#: 84729

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 06 Dec 2012
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 06 Dec 2012

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: Cantonese, English, Mandarin

Education:University of Toronto, 2006

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Markham Stouffville Health Centre
Suite 407
377 Church Street
Markham ON  L6B 1A1
Phone: (905) 472-7122
Fax: (905) 472-9240 Electoral District: 05

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Drs. Yang & Yuen Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Mar 22 2013

Shareholders:
Dr. S. Yuen ( CPSO# 84760 )
Dr. S. Yang ( CPSO# 84729 )

Business Address:
Markham Stouffville Health Centre
Suite 407
377 Church Street
Markham ON  L6B 1A1
Phone Number: (905) 472-7122

Business Address:
403 - 1100 Sheppard Avenue East
Toronto ON  M2K 2W1
Phone Number: (416) 222-0660

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Markham Stouffville Hospital Markham

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
General Surgery Effective: 30 Jun 2012 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. SIMON YIE YANG may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. YANG is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2006 to 30 Jun 2007
PostGrad Yr 1 - General Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
PostGrad Yr 2 - General Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 3 - General Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 4 - Clinician Investigator

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 5 - General Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 5 - General Surgery

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2006
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2012
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 06 Dec 2012