skip to content

Yang, Jianing

CPSO#: 94814

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 02 Jun 2014
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 02 Jun 2014

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, French

Education:McGill University, 2006

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Clinique Medicentre Lasalle
1500 Dollard ave office # 201
Lasalleh8n 1t5
Montreal QC  H3G 1L5
Phone: 514-366-4507
Fax: 514-3666901

Additional Practice Location(s)

Metro MOnk medical center
2529 Rue Allard
montreal QC  H4E 2L5
Canada
Phone: 5147699999
County: 
Electoral District: 

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Jianing Yang Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Mar 27 2015

Medical Records Location

Address: Clinic Source Unique Hawkesbury 613-632-4185
Instructions: Please contact Clinic Source Unique Hawkesbury for your medical charts
Date Received: 05 Aug 2014


Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.



Quebec

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective:19 Dec 2013 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. JIANING YANG may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. YANG is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 03 Feb 2011
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 03 Feb 2011
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 02 Feb 2014
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 28 Mar 2011
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 23 Aug 2011
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee Effective: 12 Apr 2012
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee Effective: 20 Feb 2013
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 02 Jun 2014
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 02 Jun 2014