skip to content

Yang, Homer Yuen Hoo

CPSO#: 32957

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 01 Jul 1980
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 09 Nov 1981

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: Chinese, English

Education:University of Toronto, 1980

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
London Health Sciences Centre
Department Of Anesthesia &
Perioperative Medicine
339 Windermere Road
London ON  N6A 5A5
Phone: (519) 685-5800 Ext. 33031 Electoral District: 02

Additional Practice Location(s)

The Ottawa Hospital
B309, 1053 Carling Ave
Ottawa ON  K1Y 4E9
Canada
Phone: 613-761-4940
County: Regional Municipality of Ottawa-Carleton
Electoral District: 07

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Homer Yang Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  May 17 2011

Shareholders:
Dr. H. Yang ( CPSO# 32957 )

Business Address:
London Health Sciences Centre
Department of Anesthesia and Perioperative Medicin
399 Windermere Road
London ON  N6A 5A5
Phone Number: (519) 685-8500

Business Address:
800 Commissioners Road East
London ON  N6A 5W9
Phone Number: (519) 685-8500

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
London Health Sciences Centre Victoria Hospital London
London Health Sciences Centre,University Site London
St Joseph's Health Care,London - Parkwood Hospital London

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 01 Jul 1982 CFPC Specialist
Anesthesiology Effective: 06 Jun 1986 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. HOMER YUEN HOO YANG may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. YANG is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1980
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 09 Nov 1981