skip to content

Yan, Hongyun

CPSO#: 91908

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 08 Sep 2010
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 08 Sep 2010

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, Mandarin

Education:Hebei Medical College, 1987

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Hospitalist Program
Royal Victoria Regional Health Ctr
201 Georgian Drive
Barrie ON  L4M 6M2
Phone: (705) 728-9802 Electoral District: 05

Additional Practice Location(s)

Thunder Bay Regional Health Science
980 Oliver Road
Thunder Bay ON  P7B 6V4
Canada
Phone: (807) 684-6000
County: District of Thunder Bay
Electoral District: 09

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Hongyun Yan Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Sep 19 2020

Shareholders:
Dr. H. Yan ( CPSO# 91908 )

Business Address:
Hospitalist Program
Royal Victoria Regional Health Ctr
201 Georgian Drive
Barrie ON  L4M 6M2
Phone Number: (705) 728-9802

Business Address:
Thunder Bay Regional Health Science
980 Oliver Road
Thunder Bay ON  P7B 6V4
Phone Number: (807) 684-6000

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Royal Victoria Regional Health Centre Barrie
Thunder Bay Regional Health Sciences Centre Thunder Bay

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective:26 Aug 2010 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. HONGYUN YAN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. YAN is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 23 Jul 2009
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 23 Jul 2009
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 22 Jul 2012
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 08 Sep 2010
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 08 Sep 2010