skip to content

Yan, Hanmu

CPSO#: 95783

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 01 Jul 2011
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 30 Jun 2016

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: Chinese, English, Mandarin

Education:University of Toronto, 2011

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
2425 Bloor Street West, Suite 501
Toronto ON M6S 4W4
Toronto ON  M6S 4W4
Phone: (416) 767-9396
Fax: (416) 767-2403 Electoral District: 10

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Dr. Hanmu Yan Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  May 10 2016

Shareholders:
Dr. H. Yan ( CPSO# 95783 )

Business Address:
St. Joseph's Health Centre Toronto
Department of Urology
30 The Queensway
Toronto ON  M6R 1B5
Phone Number: (416) 530-6000

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
St Joseph's Health Centre,Toronto Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Urology Effective:30 Jun 2016 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. HANMU YAN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. YAN is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 1 - Urology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 2 - Urology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 3 - Urology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 4 - Urology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2015 to 30 Jun 2016
PostGrad Yr 5 - Urology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2016 to 30 Jun 2017
CF - Urology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2011
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2016