skip to content

Yammine, Nadine Vanessa

CPSO#: 91941

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 13 Jun 2011
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 13 Jun 2011

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, French

Education:University of Ottawa, 2005

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
336A King Street West
Chatham ON  N7M 1G1
Phone: (519) 397-1721
Fax: (519) 397-3687 Electoral District: 01

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: N.V. Yammine Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jan 11 2012

Shareholders:
Dr. N. Yammine ( CPSO# 91941 )

Business Address:
80 Grand Avenue West
Chatham ON  N7M 5L9
Phone Number: (519) 352-6400

Business Address:
336A King Street West
Chatham ON  N7M 1G1
Phone Number: (519) 397-1721

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Chatham-Kent Health Alliance Chatham

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Otolaryngology - Head and Neck Surgery Effective:30 Jun 2010 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. NADINE VANESSA YAMMINE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. YAMMINE is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



Western University, 01 Jul 2009 to 31 Jul 2009
EL - Otolaryngology - Head and Neck Surgery

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 30 Jul 2009
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 31 Jul 2009
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 13 Jun 2011