skip to content

Yamada, Tetsu

CPSO#: 92660

MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Terms and conditions as of 31 Dec 2011
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None as of 31 Dec 2011

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Education:Kyoto Daigaku Igakubu, 2000

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



University of Toronto, 03 May 2010 to 20 Jul 2010
PEAP - Clinical Fellow - Thoracic Surgery

University of Toronto, 21 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
Clinical Fellow - Thoracic Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2011 to 31 Dec 2011
Clinical Fellow - Thoracic Surgery

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 03 May 2010
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 21 Jul 2010
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 31 Dec 2011