skip to content

Yakub, Abu Mohammed

CPSO#: 87954

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 27 Apr 2018
EXPIRY DATE
29 Dec 2019
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Restricted as of 27 Apr 2018
Flag: Indicates a concern or additional information

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: Bengali, English, Farsi, Hindi, Urdu

Education:University of Dhaka, 1981

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
9-7990 Kennedy Road South
Brampton ON  L6W 0B3
Phone: 905-455-5445
Fax: 905-455-5665 Electoral District: 05

Additional Practice Location(s)

537 Van Kirk Drive, unit #103
Brampton ON  L7A 0C1
Canada
Phone: 905-495-5550
Fax: 905-495-2624
County: Regional Municipality of Peel
Electoral District: 05

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Dr. Abu M. Yakub Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  May 02 2008

Shareholders:
Dr. A. Yakub ( CPSO# 87954 )

Business Address:
Suite 9
7990 Kennedy Road South
Brampton ON  L6W 0A2
Phone Number: (905) 455-5445

Business Address:
103 - 537 Van Kirk Drive
Brampton ON  L7A 0C1
Phone Number: (905) 495-5550

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 27 Apr 2018 CPSO Recognized Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 21 Dec 2007
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 21 Dec 2007
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 20 Dec 2010
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee Effective: 24 Dec 2010
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee Effective: 28 Mar 2011
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee Effective: 30 Jun 2011
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee Effective: 30 Jun 2014
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee Effective: 26 Sep 2014
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee Effective: 15 Sep 2015
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee Effective: 17 Oct 2016
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 30 Jun 2017
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 27 Apr 2018
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee Effective: 02 Nov 2018
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee Effective: 16 May 2019
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration Expiry Date: 29 Dec 2019

Practice Restrictions Flag: indicates a concern or additional information

Imposed By Effective Date Expiry Date Status
Registration Committee Effective: 16 May 2019 Active
             1.    Dr.  Abu  Mohammed  Yakub  may  practise family medicine, while under the
                  supervision coordinated by a supervisor  acceptable to the College at the
                  following locations:

                  (i)   184 Clarence Street in Brampton, Ontario; 
                  
                  (ii)  537 Van Kirk Drive in Brampton, Ontario; and

                  (iii) 7990 Kennedy Road South in Brampton, Ontario.

            2.    The certificate of registration will automatically expire on December 29,
                  2019.

            3.    The certificate of registration automatically  expires upon the following
                  events, unless the Registration Committee renews  the certificate with or
                  without additional or other terms, conditions and limitations:

                  (i)   the supervisor notifies the College of any concerns  regarding  Dr.
                        Yakub's  knowledge,  skill,  judgment or attitude, does not provide
                        the required reports to the College  by  the  due  date  or  if the
                        reports are unsatisfactory in form or content, or
                  
                  (ii)  the  supervisor  is  no  longer  able  or  willing  to  continue to
                        supervise Dr. Yakub's practice, or
                  
                  (iii) the College finds the assessment report, pertaining to the  on-site
                        assessment of Dr. Yakub's practice unsatisfactory. 
                  
            Note: This  certificate  is  issued  on  April  27, 2018, and will expire on or
                  before December 29, 2019, in accordance with paragraphs 2 and 3 above.