skip to content

Yahmad, Nagib Yahya Ramadan

CPSO#: 92145

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 09 Aug 2010
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 09 Aug 2010

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: Arabic, English

Education:University of Al Fateh, 1998

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Health Plus
Unit 3
640 Eglinton Avenue
Mississauga ON  L5R 3V2
Phone: (905) 268-0520
Fax: (905) 268-0521 Electoral District: 05

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Dr. Nagib Yahmad Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jan 27 2011

Shareholders:
Dr. N. Yahmad ( CPSO# 92145 )

Business Address:
Health Plus
3- 640 Eglinton Avenue
Mississauga ON  L5R 3V2
Phone Number: (905) 268-0520

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Neurology Effective:27 May 2010 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. NAGIB YAHYA RAMADAN YAHMAD may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. YAHMAD is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



University Of Toronto, 08 Aug 2011 to 30 Oct 2011
PEAP - CF - Neurology

University Of Toronto, 31 Oct 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
CF - Neurology

University Of Toronto, 01 Jul 2012 to 07 Aug 2012
CF - Neurology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 29 Sep 2009
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 29 Sep 2009
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 28 Sep 2012
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 09 Aug 2010
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 09 Aug 2010