skip to content

Yaghoobi, Mohammad

CPSO#: 85515

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 24 Jul 2014
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 24 Jul 2014

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: Yaghoobi Juibari, Mohammad (used until: 07 Nov 2007 )

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Tehran, 1999

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
1280 Main Street West-2F
Hamilton ON  L8S 4K1
Phone: (905) 521-2100
Fax: (905) 521-4958 Electoral District: 04

Additional Practice Location(s)

9080 Yonge St
Richmond Hill ON  L4C 0Y7
Canada
County: Regional Municipality of York
Electoral District: 05

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Dr. Mohammad Yaghoobi Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Apr 01 2015

Shareholders:
Dr. M. Yaghoobi ( CPSO# 85515 )

Business Address:
McMaster University Medical Centre
Division of Gastroenterology
Room 2 F
1280 Main Street West
Hamilton ON  L8S 4K1
Phone Number: (905) 521-2100

Business Address:
50 Charlton Avenue East
Hamilton ON  L8N 4A6
Phone Number: (905) 522-1155

Business Address:
Level 2
9080 Yonge Street
Richmond Hill ON  L4C 0Y7
Phone Number: (647) 729-8666

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Hamilton Health Sciences Centre McMaster & Childrens Hosp Mc,Master & Childr Hamilton
Hamilton Health Sciences,General Site Hamilton
Hamilton Health Sciences,Juravinski Hospital and Cancer Centre Hamilton
St Joseph's Healthcare System,Hamilton Hamilton

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective:31 Aug 2012 RCPSC Specialist
Gastroenterology Effective:29 Oct 2013 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. MOHAMMAD YAGHOOBI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. YAGHOOBI is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



McMaster University, 01 Sep 2006 to 20 Oct 2006
PEAP - CF - Gastroenterology

McMaster University, 21 Oct 2006 to 30 Jun 2007
CF - Gastroenterology

University of Toronto, 01 Nov 2007 to 02 Dec 2007
PEAP - R - Medical Genetics and Genomics

University of Toronto, 03 Dec 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
PostGrad Yr 1 - Medical Genetics and Genomics

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2008 to 02 Dec 2008
PostGrad Yr 1 - Medical Genetics and Genomics

University of Toronto, 03 Dec 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 2 - Medical Genetics and Genomics

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2009 to 31 Aug 2009
PostGrad Yr 1 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Sep 2009 to 31 Aug 2010
PostGrad Yr 2 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Sep 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 3 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2011 to 31 Aug 2011
PostGrad Yr 3 - Internal Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Sep 2006
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 24 Oct 2006
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2007
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Nov 2007
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 03 Dec 2007
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 31 Aug 2011
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 24 Jul 2014