skip to content

Yadav, Geeta

CPSO#: 93286

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 01 Jul 2010
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 30 Sep 2015

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, French, Hindi

Education:Northern Ontario School of Medicine, 2010

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
2533 Danforth Ave
Toronto ON  M4C 1L1
Phone: 4166985521
Fax: 4166985721 Electoral District: 10

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Dr. Geeta Yadav Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Sep 22 2020

Shareholders:
Dr. G. Yadav ( CPSO# 93286 )

Business Address:
2533 Danforth Avenue
Toronto ON  M4C 1L1
Phone Number: (416) 698-5521

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Women's College Hospital Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Dermatology Effective:30 Sep 2015 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. GEETA YADAV may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. YADAV is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 1 - Dermatology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 2 - Dermatology

University Of Toronto, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 3 - Dermatology

University Of Toronto, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 4 - Dermatology

University Of Toronto, 01 Jul 2014 to 02 Oct 2014
PostGrad Yr 4 - Dermatology

University Of Toronto, 03 Oct 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 5 - Dermatology

University Of Toronto, 01 Jul 2015 to 30 Sep 2015
PostGrad Yr 5 - Dermatology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2010
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Sep 2015