skip to content

YADAV, MAHESH Prasad

CPSO#: 24861

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 18 Jul 1972
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 17 Jul 1972

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, Hindi, Marathi, Urdu

Education:Nagpur University, 1963

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Yadav Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Sep 22 2020

Shareholders:
Dr. M. YADAV ( CPSO# 24861 )

Business Address:
504 - 1221 Algonquin Avenue
North Bay ON  P1B 4Y3
Phone Number: (705) 472-2044

Medical Records Location

Instructions: Patients looking to obtain a copy of their medical record may submit a written request to: 1221 Algonquin Avenue Suite 504, North Bay ON, P1B 4Y3.
Date Received: 07 Feb 2020

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Orthopedic Surgery Effective:16 Nov 1971 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. MAHESH PRASAD YADAV may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. YADAV is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Mar 1967
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 1970
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jan 1971
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 17 Jul 1972