skip to content

Ren, Yi Mi

CPSO#: 100331

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 15 Apr 2019
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 15 Apr 2019

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, Mandarin

Education:Queen's University, 2013

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Richardson Laboratory
88 Stuart St
Kingston ON  K7L 3N6
Phone: 6135496666 Ext. 7807 Electoral District: 06

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Ren Xu Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Nov 19 2019

Shareholders:
Dr. S. Xu ( CPSO# 98289 )
Dr. Y. Ren ( CPSO# 100331)

Business Address:
Richardson Laboratory
88 Stuart Street
Kingston ON  K7L 3N6
Phone Number: (424) 308-3401

Business Address:
Kingston General Hospital
76 Stuart Street
Kingston ON  K7L 2V7
Phone Number: (310) 871-5877


Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.



USA - California

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Anatomical Pathology Effective:30 Jun 2018 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. YI MI REN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. REN is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



Queen's University, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 1 - Laboratory Medicine

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 2 - Anatomical Pathology

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2015 to 30 Jun 2016
PostGrad Yr 3 - Anatomical Pathology

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2016 to 30 Jun 2017
PostGrad Yr 4 - Anatomical Pathology

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2017 to 30 Jun 2018
PostGrad Yr 5 - Anatomical Pathology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2013
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2018
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 15 Apr 2019