skip to content

Ge, Yin

CPSO#: 100231

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 01 Jul 2013
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 30 Jun 2014

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: Chinese, English, French

Education: McGill University Faculty of Medicine an, 2010

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
30 Bond St
Toronto ON  M5B 1W8
Phone: 416-864-5062
Fax: 416-864-5566 Electoral District: 10

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: S. Liu and Y. Ge Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jan 24 2017

Shareholders:
Dr. S. Liu ( CPSO# 95610 )
Dr. Y. Ge ( CPSO# 100231)

Business Address:
Markham Stouffville
PO Box 1800
381 Church Street
Markham ON  L3P 7P3
Phone Number: (905) 472-7000

Business Address:
30 Bond Street
Toronto ON  M5B 1W8
Phone Number: (416) 360-4000

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Markham Stouffville Hospital Markham
St Joseph's Health Centre,Toronto Toronto
St Michael's Hospital Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective:30 Jun 2014 RCPSC Specialist
Cardiology Effective:16 Nov 2016 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. YIN GE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. GE is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 4 - Cardiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 5 - Cardiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2015 to 30 Jun 2016
PostGrad Yr 6 - Cardiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2013
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2014