skip to content

Al Nasser, Yasser Ahmad H

CPSO#: 92728

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 25 Jan 2017
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 25 Jan 2017

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: Arabic, English

Education:Umm Al Qura University, 2006

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Kidcrew
1440 Bathurst Street
Toronto ON  M5R 3S3
Phone: (416) 654-5437
Fax: (647) 689-2371 Electoral District: 10

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Al Nasser Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Jul 15 2021

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.



Saudi Arabia

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Hamilton Health Sciences Centre McMaster & Childrens Hosp Mc,Master & Childr Hamilton

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Pediatrics Effective:17 Jun 2015 RCPSC Specialist
Gastroenterology Effective:08 Oct 2015 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. YASSER AHMAD H AL NASSER may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. AL NASSER is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



University Of Toronto, 17 May 2010 to 30 Jun 2010
PEAP - R - Pediatrics

University Of Toronto, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 1 - Pediatrics

University Of Toronto, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 2 - Pediatrics

University Of Toronto, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 3 - Pediatrics

University Of Toronto, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 4 - Paediatric Gastroenterology

University Of Toronto, 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 5 - Paediatric Gastroenterology

University Of Toronto, 01 Jul 2015 to 30 Jun 2016
CF - Paediatric Gastroenterology

University Of Toronto, 01 Jul 2016 to 30 Sep 2016
CF - Paediatric Gastroenterology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 17 May 2010
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2010
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Sep 2016
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 01 Oct 2016
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee Effective: 10 Nov 2016
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 25 Jan 2017
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 25 Jan 2017