skip to content

Xu, Ya Sophia

CPSO#: 88682

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 01 Jul 2008
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 16 Aug 2012

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:McMaster University, 2008

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
201-2951 Walker's Line
Burlington ON  L7M 4Y1
Phone: (855) 210-0757 Ext. 311
Fax: (855) 210-0758 Electoral District: 04

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Sophia Xu Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Apr 21 2014

Shareholders:
Dr. Y. Xu ( CPSO# 88682 )

Business Address:
2119 Old Lakeshore Road
Burlington ON  L7R 1A4
Phone Number: (855) 210-0707

Business Address:
M8 - 414 Victoria Avenue North
Hamilton ON  L8L 5G8
Phone Number: (855) 210-0707

Business Address:
2951 Walker's Line
Burlington ON  L7M 4Y1
Phone Number: (855) 210-0757

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Pediatrics Effective:30 Jun 2012 RCPSC Specialist
Clinical Immunology and Allergy Effective:26 Oct 2013 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. YA SOPHIA XU may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. XU is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



McMaster University, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 1 - Pediatrics

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 2 - Pediatrics

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 3 - Pediatrics

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 4 - Paediatric Clinical Immunology and Allergy

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 5 - Paediatric Clinical Immunology and Allergy

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2008
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 16 Aug 2012