skip to content

Xu, Shuang

CPSO#: 92843

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 01 Jul 2010
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 30 Jun 2016

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:McMaster University, 2010

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
200 University Avenue West
Waterloo ON  N2L 3G1
Phone: (519) 888-4567 Electoral District: 03

Additional Practice Location(s)

168 Reynolds Walk
Guelph ON  N1G 4Z8
Canada
Phone: 519-824-4120
County: County of Wellington
Electoral District: 03

123 James St. North #300
Hamilton ON  L8R 2K8
Canada
Phone: 905-667-4848
County: Regional Municipality of Hamilton-Wentworth
Electoral District: 04

700 Coronation Blvd.
Cambridge ON  N1R3G2
Canada
County: Regional Municipality of Waterloo
Electoral District: 03

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Dr. Shuang Xu Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Sep 19 2020

Shareholders:
Dr. S. Xu ( CPSO# 92843 )

Business Address:
Homewood Health Centre
150 Delhi Street
Guelph ON  N1E 6K9
Phone Number: (519) 824-1010

Business Address:
28 Suter Cres
Dundas ON  L9H 6R5

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Guelph General Hospital Guelph
Homewood Health Centre Guelph

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Psychiatry Effective:30 Jun 2016 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. SHUANG XU may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. XU is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



McMaster University, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 1 - Psychiatry

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 2 - Psychiatry

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 3 - Psychiatry

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 4 - Psychiatry

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 4 - Psychiatry

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2015 to 30 Jun 2016
PostGrad Yr 5 - Psychiatry

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2010
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2016