skip to content

Xiang, Shuo

CPSO#: 98091

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 01 Jul 2012
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 30 Jun 2017

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 2012

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Mental Health Outpatient Programs
Adult Outpatient Programs AOP
Scarborough General Hospital
1225 Kennedy Rd., Unit J
Scarborough ON  M1P 4Y1
Phone: (416)431-8135 Ext. 8506
Fax: (416)431-8233 Electoral District: 10

Additional Practice Location(s)

Dr. Xiang's Psychiatry Clinic
Located inside the IDA Pharmacy at
???/Richlane/l'avenue des bistros
Unit 15, 9425 Leslie Street
Richmond Hill ON  L4B 3N7
Canada
Phone: (647)955-1060
Fax: (647) 689-6508
County: Regional Municipality of York
Electoral District: 05

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Dr. Shuo Xiang Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jun 10 2019

Shareholders:
Dr. S. Xiang ( CPSO# 98091 )

Business Address:
J-1225 Kennedy Road
Scarborough ON  M1P 4Y1
Phone Number: (416) 431-8135

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Scarborough Hospital Birchmount Toronto
Scarborough Hospital,General Site Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Psychiatry Effective:30 Jun 2017 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. SHUO XIANG may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. XIANG is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



Queen's University, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 1 - Psychiatry

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 2 - Psychiatry

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 3 - Psychiatry

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2015 to 30 Jun 2016
PostGrad Yr 4 - Psychiatry

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2016 to 30 Jun 2017
PostGrad Yr 5 - Psychiatry

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2012
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2017