skip to content

Xi, Wang

CPSO#: 95263

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 01 Jul 2011
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 21 Jun 2013

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:The University of Western Ontario, 2011

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Cobourg Medical Centre
Unit 5 - 1060 Burnham Street
Cobourg ON  K9A 5V9
Phone: (905) 373-8333
Fax: (905) 373-9333 Electoral District: 06

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Wang Xi Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jul 02 2013

Shareholders:
Dr. W. Xi ( CPSO# 95263 )

Business Address:
Cobourg Medical Centre
5 - 1060 Burnham Street
Cobourg ON  K9A 5V9
Phone Number: (905) 373-8333

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Northumberland Hills Hospital,Cobourg District General Site Cobourg

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 19 Jun 2013 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. WANG XI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. XI is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2011
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 21 Jun 2013