skip to content

Xi, Neng Nancy

CPSO#: 95807

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 01 Jul 2011
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 21 Jun 2013

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, Mandarin

Education: University of Toronto, 2011

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
130 Dunn Ave
Toronto Rehabilitation Institute
Toronto ON  M6K 2R7
Phone: 416-597-3422 Ext. 2255
Fax: 416-597-3064 Electoral District: 10

Additional Practice Location(s)

76 Grenville St
Women's College Hospital
Toronto ON  M5S 1B2
Canada
Phone: 416-323-6400 Ext. 5580
Fax: 416-323-6215
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Dr. Nancy Xi and Dr. Howard An Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Sep 02 2014

Shareholders:
Dr. N. Xi ( CPSO# 95807 )
Dr. H. An ( CPSO# 96228 )

Business Address:
130 Dunn Ave
Toronto Rehabilitation Institute
Toronto ON  M6K 2R7
Phone Number: 416-597-3422

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
University Health Network,Toronto Rehabilitation Institute Toronto
Women's College Hospital Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective:17 Jun 2013 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. NENG NANCY XI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. XI is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



McMaster University, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 3 - Family Medicine (Enhanced Skills)

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2011
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 21 Jun 2013