skip to content

Wytsma, Julia Laura

CPSO#: 92842

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 01 Jul 2010
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 11 Mar 2013

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:McMaster University, 2010

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Trillium Health Partners
Credit Valley Hospital
2200 Eglinton Ave W
Mississauga ON  L5M 2N1
Phone: (905) 813-2200 Electoral District: 05

Additional Practice Location(s)

University Health Network
200 Elizabeth St
Toronto
Toronto ON  M5G2C4
Canada
Phone: 416-340-3131
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Dr. Julia Wytsma Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Nov 10 2015

Shareholders:
Dr. J. Wytsma ( CPSO# 92842 )

Business Address:
200 Elizabeth Street
Toronto ON  M5G 2C4
Phone Number: (416) 340-3131

Business Address:
Trillium Health Partners
Credit Valley Hospital
2200 Eglinton Avenue West
Mississauga ON  L5M 2N1
Phone Number: (905) 813-2200

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Trillium Health Partners,The Credit Valley Hospital Mississauga
University Health Network,Toronto General Hospital Site Toronto
University Health Network,Toronto Western Hospital Site Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective:18 Jun 2012 CFPC Specialist
Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine) Effective:17 Oct 2013 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. JULIA LAURA WYTSMA may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. WYTSMA is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



University Of Toronto, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

University Of Toronto, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

University Of Toronto, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 3 - Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine)

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2010
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 11 Mar 2013