skip to content

Wynd, Kimberly Pauline

CPSO#: 89921

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 18 Dec 2009
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 18 Dec 2009

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:National University of Ireland, 2003

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Peterborough Regional Health Centre
Department of Anaesthesia
1 Hospital Drive
Peterborough ON  K9J 7C6
Phone: (705) 743-2121 Electoral District: 06

Additional Practice Location(s)

Dr. Cory Torgerson
Facial Cosmetic Surgery
59 Hayden St. 7th Floor
Toronto ON  M4Y0E7
Canada
Phone: 647-343-0207
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Kimberly P. Wynd Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Sep 16 2020

Shareholders:
Dr. K. Wynd ( CPSO# 89921 )

Business Address:
Dr. Cory Torgerson
Facial Cosmetic Surgery
59 Hayden Street, 7th Floor
Toronto ON  M4Y 0E7
Phone Number: (647) 343-0207

Business Address:
Peterborough Regional Health Centre
Department of Anaesthesia
1 Hospital Drive
Peterborough ON  K9J 7C6
Phone Number: (705) 876-5038

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Peterborough Regional Health Centre Peterborough
Royal Victoria Regional Health Centre Barrie

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Anesthesiology Effective:28 May 2009 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. KIMBERLY PAULINE WYND may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. WYND is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 15 Oct 2008
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 15 Oct 2008
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 14 Oct 2011
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 18 Dec 2009
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 18 Dec 2009