skip to content

Wyatt, Emma Louise

CPSO#: 91500

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 01 Jul 2010
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Restricted as of 01 Jul 2010

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Western Australia, 2000

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
McMaster Children's Hospital
Division of Emergency Medicine
Department of Paediatrics
1280 Main St W, HSC 2N49I
Hamilton ON  L8S 4K1
Phone: (905) 521-2100 Electoral District: 04

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Sulowski Wyatt Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Aug 21 2012

Shareholders:
Dr. C. Sulowski ( CPSO# 84710 )
Dr. E. Wyatt ( CPSO# 91500 )

Business Address:
McMaster Children's Hospital
1280 Main Street West
Hamilton ON  L8S 4K1
Phone Number: (905) 521-2100


Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.



Australia

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Hamilton Health Sciences Centre McMaster & Childrens Hosp Mc,Master & Childr Hamilton

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Pediatric Emergency Medicine Effective:19 Apr 2018 CPSO Recognized Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2009
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 23 Sep 2009
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2010
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2010
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee Effective: 22 Jun 2017
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee Effective: 19 Apr 2018

Practice Restrictions

Imposed By Effective Date Expiry Date Status
Registration Committee Effective: 19 Apr 2018 Active
             Dr.  Emma  Louise  Wyatt  may  practise  medicine  independently  in paediatric
            emergency medicine.