skip to content

Wu, Zijing

CPSO#: 101028

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 01 Jul 2013
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 30 Jun 2017

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: Chinese, English

Education:University of Auckland, 2012

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Queen's University
Department of Medicine
Etherington Hall Room 1018
94 Stuart Street
Kingston ON  K2L 3N6
Phone: (613) 533-2538
Fax: 6135336654 Electoral District: 06

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Kingston Health Sciences Centre Kingston

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 30 Jun 2017 RCPSC Specialist
General Internal Medicine Effective: 26 Sep 2018 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. ZIJING WU may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. WU is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



Queen's University, 01 Jul 2013 to 22 Sep 2013
Assessment Verification Period - Internal Medicine

Queen's University, 23 Sep 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 1 - Internal Medicine

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 2 - Internal Medicine

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2015 to 30 Jun 2016
PostGrad Yr 3 - Internal Medicine

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2016 to 30 Jun 2017
PostGrad Yr 4 - Internal Medicine

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2017 to 30 Jun 2018
PostGrad Yr 5 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2018 to 30 Jun 2019
Clinical Fellow - Internal Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2013
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 23 Sep 2013
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2017