skip to content

Wu, Sing Man

CPSO#: 29261

MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Resigned from membership as of 31 Dec 2017
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None as of 31 Dec 2017

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: Cantonese, English

Education:University of Toronto, 1976

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Dr. S.M. Wu Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: May 24 2018

Medical Records Location

Address: RSRS Medical Records Management & Informatics 111 St. Regis Crescent S Toronto, ON M3J 1Y6 1-888-563-3732
Instructions: Record inquires should be directed to RSRS Medical Records Management & Inforrmatics
Date Received: 25 Jan 2018

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
No Speciality Reported

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 27 Jun 1977
Transfer of class of certificate to: Restricted certificate Effective: 27 Sep 2017
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate Effective: 27 Sep 2017
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 31 Dec 2017