skip to content

Wu, Robert Chi

CPSO#: 93135

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 27 Jun 2018
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 27 Jun 2018

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 2010

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Taunton Surgical Center
1300 Keith Ross Drive
2nd Floor
Oshawa ON  L1H 7K4
Phone: (905) 721-3495
Fax: (905) 721-2470 Electoral District: 05

Additional Practice Location(s)

Lakeridge Health Oshawa
1 Hospital Court
Oshawa ON  L1G 2B9
Canada
Phone: (905) 576-8711
County: Regional Municipality of Durham
Electoral District: 05

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Robert C. Wu Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jan 28 2019

Shareholders:
Dr. R. Wu ( CPSO# 93135 )

Business Address:
Taunton Surgical Center
1300 Keirth Ross Drive
Oshawa ON  L1H 7K4
Phone Number: (905) 723-8551

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
General Surgery Effective: 30 Jun 2017 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. ROBERT CHI WU may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. WU is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jul 2011
PostGrad Yr 1 - General Surgery

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 2 - General Surgery

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 3 - General Surgery

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 4 - Clinician Investigator

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2014 to 31 Aug 2014
PostGrad Yr 5 - General Surgery

University of Ottawa, 01 Sep 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 5 - Clinician Investigator

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2015 to 30 Jun 2016
PostGrad Yr 6 - General Surgery

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2016 to 30 Jun 2017
PostGrad Yr 7 - General Surgery

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2010
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2017
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 27 Jun 2018