skip to content

Wu, Melinda Yung-Shen

CPSO#: 91703

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 01 Jul 2009
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 15 Jul 2011

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 2009

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Family Practice Health Centre
Women's College Hospital
77 Grenville Street
Toronto ON  M5S 1B6
Phone: (416) 323-6060 Ext. +1+4
Fax: (416) 323-6402 Electoral District: 10

Additional Practice Location(s)

Breast Centre
Women's College Hospital
76 Grenville Street, floor 5
Toronto, Ontario
Toronto ON  M5S 1B2
Canada
Phone: 416-323-6225
Fax: 416-323-7730
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10

Breast Centre
Princess Margaret Cancer Centre
610 University Ave, 2nd floor
Toronto, Ontario
Toronto ON  M5G 2M9
Canada
Phone: 416-946-2297
Fax: 416-946-2370
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Dr. Melinda Wu Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Sep 23 2020

Shareholders:
Dr. M. Wu ( CPSO# 91703 )

Business Address:
Family Practice Health Centre
Women's College Hospital
76 Grenville Street
Toronto ON  M5S 1B6
Phone Number: (416) 323-6060

Business Address:
Princess Margaret Hospital
Breast Centre 2nd Floor
610 University Avenue
Toronto ON  M5G 2M9
Phone Number: (416) 946-2297

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
University Health Network Princess Margaret Hospital-Ontario,Cancer Institu Toronto
Women's College Hospital Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective:24 Jun 2011 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. MELINDA YUNG-SHEN WU may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. WU is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 3 - Family Medicine (Enhanced Skills)

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2009
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 15 Jul 2011