skip to content

Wu, Jenny

CPSO#: 94574

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 01 Nov 2010
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Restricted as of 01 Nov 2010

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, Mandarin

Education:University of Miami, 1994

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
KMH Cardiology & Diagnostic Centres
55 Town Centre Court, Suite 109
Scarborough ON  M1P 4X4
Phone: (905) 855-1320
Fax: 2893733031 Electoral District: 10

Additional Practice Location(s)

KMH Cardiology & Diagnostic Centres
50 Minthorn Blvd, Suite 101
Markham ON  L3T 7X8
Canada
Phone: (905) 855-1320
Fax: 289-373-3031
County: Regional Municipality of York
Electoral District: 05

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Dr. Lawrence Tong Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Dec 06 2012

Shareholders:
Dr. L. Tong ( CPSO# 92559 )
Dr. J. Wu ( CPSO# 94574 )

Business Address:
507 - 7 St Thomas Street
Toronto ON  M5S 2B7

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Cardiology Effective:01 Nov 2010 CPSO Recognized Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 01 Nov 2010
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 01 Nov 2010
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 30 Apr 2012
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee Effective: 29 Oct 2012
Expiry date removed from certificate of registration. Effective: 30 Oct 2012

Practice Restrictions

Imposed By Effective Date Expiry Date Status
Registration Committee Effective: 29 Oct 2012 Active
             Dr. Jenny Wu may practise medicine independently in cardiology, only.