skip to content

Wu, Jane Zhen Zhen

CPSO#: 95073

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 01 Jul 2011
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 30 Jun 2016

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:McMaster University, 2011

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Cleveland Clinic
181 Bay St
Toronto ON  M5J 2T3
Phone: 4165076600
Fax: 4165076610 Electoral District: 10

Additional Practice Location(s)

Cleveland Clinic
181 Bay St, 30th floor
Toronto ON  M5J 2T3
Canada
Phone: (416) 507-6600
Fax: (416) 507-6610
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Dr. Jane Wu Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Nov 09 2016

Shareholders:
Dr. J. Wu ( CPSO# 95073 )

Business Address:
3000 - 181 Bay Street
Toronto ON  M5J 2T3
Phone Number: (416) 507-6600

Business Address:
Suite CN0110
100 King Street West
Toronto ON  M5X 1A9
Phone Number: (416) 861-8600

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Dermatology Effective:30 Jun 2016 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. JANE ZHEN ZHEN WU may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. WU is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



University Of Toronto, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 1 - Dermatology

University Of Toronto, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 2 - Dermatology

University Of Toronto, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 3 - Dermatology

University Of Toronto, 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 4 - Dermatology

University Of Toronto, 01 Jul 2015 to 30 Jun 2016
PostGrad Yr 5 - Dermatology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2011
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2016