skip to content

Wu, Henry Mou Wai

CPSO#: 28704

MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Resigned from membership as of 01 Jun 2017
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None as of 19 Aug 1976

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: Chinese, English

Education:University of Toronto, 1975

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Henry Wu Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: May 30 2017

Medical Records Location

Address: Hillside Medical Centre 520 Ellesmere Road Unit 403 Scarborough ON M1R 0B1
Date Received: 21 Apr 2017

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
No Speciality Reported

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 16 Jun 1975
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 14 Jun 1976
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Temporary Employment Practice Certificate Effective: 21 Jun 1976
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 19 Aug 1976
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 01 Jun 2017