skip to content

Wu, Christopher Han-Yang

CPSO#: 98280

MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Resigned from membership as of 01 Jul 2018
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None as of 30 Jun 2017

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:The University of British Columbia, 2012

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Medical Records Location

Address: 6th Floor, Box 19 60 Murray St Toronto, ON M5T 3L9
Date Received: 29 May 2018

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Urology Effective:30 Jun 2017 RCPSC Specialist

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



McMaster University, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 1 - Urology

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 2 - Urology

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 3 - Urology

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2015 to 30 Jun 2016
PostGrad Yr 4 - Urology

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2016 to 30 Jun 2017
PostGrad Yr 5 - Urology

University Of Toronto, 01 Jul 2017 to 30 Jun 2018
CF - Urology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2012
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2017
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 01 Jul 2018