skip to content

Wu Chao Ying, Valerie

CPSO#: 93652

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 25 Jan 2016
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 25 Jan 2016

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, French

Education:McGill University Faculty of Medicine an, 2010

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Dr. V. Wu Chao Ying Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Sep 16 2020

Shareholders:
Dr. V. Wu Chao Ying ( CPSO# 93652 )

Business Address:
700-790 Bay St
Toronto ON  M5G 1N8
Phone Number: (416) 551-6006

Business Address:
300-1131A Leslie St
North York ON  M3C 3L8
Phone Number: (416) 360-7360

Business Address:
40 Holly Street
Suite 301
Toronto ON  M4S 3C3
Phone Number: (416) 486-8088

Business Address:
2100 Bovaird Drive East
Brampton ON  L6R 3J7
Phone Number: (905) 494-2120

Business Address:
101 Humber College Boulevard
Etobicoke ON  M9V 1R8
Phone Number: (416) 494-2120

Business Address:
726 Upper James Street
Hamilton ON  L9C 2Z9
Phone Number: (905) 575-5743

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
William Osler Health Centre Etobicoke General Site Toronto
William Osler Health Centre-Brampton Civic Hospital Brampton

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
General Surgery Effective:30 Jun 2015 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. VALERIE WU CHAO YING may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. WU CHAO YING is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



McMaster University, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 1 - General Surgery

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 2 - General Surgery

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 3 - General Surgery

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 4 - General Surgery

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 5 - General Surgery

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2010
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2015
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 25 Jan 2016