skip to content

Wu, Bennet Pak-Yeuk

CPSO#: 29831

MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Resigned from membership as of 17 Apr 2021
EXPIRY DATE
17 Apr 2021
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Restricted as of 15 Nov 1990

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: Cantonese, English

Education:University Of Toronto, 1976

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Anson General Hospital Iroquois Falls

Hospital Notices

Source:  Hospital
Active Date:  May 7, 2018
Expiry Date:  
Summary:  
On May 1, 2018, MICs Group of Health Services (MICs), notified the CPSO, pursuant to s.33 of the Public Hospitals Act and s.85.5 of the Health Professions Procedural Code, Regulated Health Professions Act, that Dr. Wu’s hospital privileges at MICs were temporarily suspended, effective April 13, 2018 to April 17, 2018.

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
No Speciality Reported

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1976
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 28 Mar 1978
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 01 Jun 1983
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 10 Jul 1984
Transfer of class of certificate to: Restricted certificate Effective: 15 Nov 1990
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 15 Nov 1990
Terms and conditions amended by Discipline Committee Effective: 26 Jun 2002
Suspension of registration imposed: Discipline Committee Effective: 26 Aug 2002
Suspension of registration removed Effective: 26 Sep 2002
Terms and conditions amended by Executive Committee Effective: 10 May 2007
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee Effective: 01 Apr 2008
Suspension of registration imposed: Discipline Committee Effective: 01 May 2008
Suspension of registration removed Effective: 01 Aug 2008
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 17 Apr 2021

Previous Hearings

Committee: Discipline
Decision Date: 01 Apr 2008
Summary:

On April 1, 2008, the Discipline Committee of the College of Physicians and Surgeons of 
Ontario found that Dr. Bennet Pak-Yeuk committed acts of professional misconduct in that he 
has engaged in conduct or an act or omission relevant to the practice of medicine that, having 
regard to all the circumstances, would reasonably be regarded by members as disgraceful, 
dishonourable or unprofessional.    The Discipline Committee ordered the following: 
  
 
      1.    The Discipline Committee directs the Registrar to suspend Dr. Wu s certificate of 
            registration for a period of three months, to commence on May 1, 2008. 
 
      2.    The Discipline Committee directs that the following terms, conditions and 
            limitations be imposed on Dr. Wu s certificate of registration:  
 
            a)      Dr. Wu will enroll and participate in the Physician Health Program for 
                  co-dependency counseling and support for twelve months following the 
                  date of this Order;  
 
            b)      Dr. Wu will undergo, at his own expense and within four months of the 
                  date of this Order, a PREP assessment and will abide by any of its 
                  restrictions or recommendations;  
 
            c)    For a period of twelve months following the date of this Order, Dr. Wu 
                  will see a family physician acceptable to the College who has signed an 
                  undertaking with the College to report to the College once every four 
                  months to confirm that Dr. Wu is complying with this requirement or 
                  immediately if he has any concerns that Dr. Wu has failed to comply with 
                  this Order or with the restrictions on his certificate of registration.  Dr. 
                  Wu will see this family physician a minimum of once every two months.  
                  Dr. Wu will continue with such counseling program as is prescribed and/or 
                  recommended by this physician. 
 
      3.    The Discipline Committee directs the results of this proceeding to be included in 
            the register. 
 
Therefore, the Certificate of Registration in the Province of Ontario issued in the name of Dr. 
Bennet Pak-Yeuk is suspended effective May 1, 2008 at 12:01 a.m. and the terms, conditions and 
limitations are effective, April 1, 2008 at 5:00 p.m. 
 
  
 
 


Decision: Download Full Decision (PDF)
Appeal: No Appeal
Hearing Date(s): Apr 01, 2008

 

Committee: Discipline
Decision Date: 26 Jun 2002
Summary:

On June 26, 2002, the Discipline Committee of the College of Physicians and Surgeons of 
Ontario, having found Dr. Bennet Pak-Yeuk Wu committed an act of professional misconduct   
for an act or omission relevant to the practice of medicine that, having regard to all the 
circumstances, would reasonably be regarded by members as disgraceful, dishonourable or 
unprofessional, directed, inter alia, that: 
 
1.    Dr. Wu attend before this panel to be reprimanded and the reprimand be recorded on the 
      register. 
 
2.    The results of this proceeding be included in the register 
 
3.    The Registrar suspend Dr. Wu s certificate of registration for a period of six (6) months, 
      five (5) months of which are to be suspended if Dr. Wu successfully completes an ethics 
      course acceptable to the College within a specified time. 
 
4.    The one-month period of net suspension shall be commenced within 60 days of the date 
      of this order; 
 
5.    The Registrar to impose the following terms, conditions and limitations on Dr. Wu s 
      certificate of registration for an indefinite period of time and to include the terms, 
      conditions and limitations in the register: 
 
      (a)   that Dr. Wu be restricted from prescribing any controlled substances as defined by 
            the Controlled Drugs and Substances Act, 1996, being any substance included in 
            Schedule I, II, III, IV, or V of that Act; 
 
      (b)   that Dr. Wu see a psychiatrist acceptable to the College for a two (2) year period, 
            who will provide written reports to the College every six (6) months for two (2) 
            years; 
 
      (c)   that Dr. Wu s family physician provide written reports to the College every three 
            (3) months for a two (2) year period 
 
      (d)   that Dr. Wu obtain signed Undertakings to report to the College in a form 
            acceptable to the College from the psychiatrist and family physician referred to in 
            6(b) and (c) within 30 days from the date of this order; and 
 
      (e)   that in the event that Dr. Wu breaches the terms of this order by prescribing either 
            directly or indirectly, controlled substances to his wife, his certificate of 
            registration shall be immediately suspended for a period of six (6) months. 
 
 
 
 


Decision: Download Full Decision (PDF)
Appeal: No Appeal
Hearing Date(s): Jun 26, 2002

Concerns

Source: Inquiries, Complaints and Reports Committee
Active Date: April 17, 2021
Expiry Date:
Summary:
Summary of the Undertaking given by Dr. Bennet Pak-Yeuk Wu to the College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario, effective April 17, 2021:

A College investigation was conducted into whether Dr. Wu engaged in professional misconduct and/or is incompetent in his general medicine practice. During the investigation, Dr. Wu resigned from the College and has agreed never to apply or reapply for registration as a physician in Ontario or any other jurisdiction.
Download Full Document (PDF)