skip to content

Wronzberg, Jordan Samuel Adam

CPSO#: 95884

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 15 Jan 2014
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 15 Jan 2014

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Ottawa, 2011

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Carlisle Medical Centre
1493 Centre Road
Carlisle ON  L0R 1H0
Phone: 905-689-3301
Fax: 905-689-5772 Electoral District: 04

Additional Practice Location(s)

Mount Nemo Christian Nursing Home
4486 Guelph Line
Burlington ON  L7P 0N2
Canada
Phone: 905-335-3636
County: Regional Municipality of Halton
Electoral District: 04

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Dr. Jordan Wronzberg Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Nov 05 2014

Shareholders:
Dr. J. Wronzberg ( CPSO# 95884 )
Dr. C. O'Connor ( CPSO# 96128 )

Business Address:
1493 Centre Road
Carlisle ON  L0R 1H0
Phone Number: (905) 689-3301

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective:19 Dec 2013 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. JORDAN SAMUEL ADAM WRONZBERG may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. WRONZBERG is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



McMaster University, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2011
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2013
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 09 Aug 2013
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 15 Jan 2014
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 15 Jan 2014