skip to content

Wright-Bowman, Helen Cooper

CPSO#: 15039

MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Resigned from membership as of 01 Jun 2000
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None as of 01 Jun 2000

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Date of Death: 25-Jan-2015

Former Name: Bowman, Helen Cooper (used until: 30 Jul 1987 )

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, French

Education:University of Glasgow, 1950

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Anesthesiology Effective: 01 Jan 1960 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 21 Feb 1955
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 01 Jun 2000