skip to content

Wright, Laura Elizabeth

CPSO#: 92841

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 01 Jul 2010
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 27 Jun 2012

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:McMaster University, 2010

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Stonechurch Family Health Centre
1475 Upper Ottawa Street
Hamilton ON  L8W 3J6
Phone: (905) 575-7757
Fax: (905) 575-1539 Electoral District: 04

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Dr. Laura Wright Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jan 07 2016

Shareholders:
Dr. L. Wright ( CPSO# 92841 )

Business Address:
Stonechurch Family Health Centre
1475 Upper Ottawa Street
Hamilton ON  L8W 3J6
Phone Number: (905) 575-7757

Medical Records Location

Instructions: Patients who have seen Dr. Wright at Mohawk College may email Ms. Louisa Drost at: [email protected]
Date Received: 04 Jul 2016

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Hamilton Health Sciences Centre McMaster & Childrens Hosp Mc,Master & Childr Hamilton
Hamilton Health Sciences,General Site Hamilton
Hamilton Health Sciences,Juravinski Hospital and Cancer Centre Hamilton
St Joseph's Healthcare System,Hamilton Hamilton

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective:18 Jun 2012 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. LAURA ELIZABETH WRIGHT may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. WRIGHT is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



McMaster University, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2010
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 27 Jun 2012